Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mario Duarte, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rick Martindale, against Family Security Insurance Company Inc, represented by C Revels Iii, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category20 - Contract Indebt / Auto Neg /Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT
Date: October 28, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & AVOIDANCE BY PLTF
Date: October 21, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT
Date: October 28, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT
Date: October 04, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/7/21
Date: July 07, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & AVOIDANCE BY PLTF | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY C DEWITT REVELS III ESQ OBO DEFT | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/7/21 | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.