Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Steven Lamb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bobby Lean Jr, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Danielle Wall, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category20 - Contract Indebt / Auto Neg /Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/7/21
Date: July 07, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT
Date: July 27, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (AGREED)- JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/28/21 | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CMPL BY DEFT | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY DANIELLE M WALL ESQ OBO DEFT | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/7/21 | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.