Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Juan Andreu, against Tim R Mcdermott, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category20 - Contract Indebt / Auto Neg /Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/7/21
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST TIM R MCDERMOTT - 9/13/21
Date: September 08, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TIM R MCDERMOTT 8/3/21
Date: August 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR BY PLTF
Date: October 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE BY PLTF
Date: September 08, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY PLTF
Date: October 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE BY PLTF
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING BY PLTF
Date: October 06, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT $12,860.87 AS TO TIM R MCDERMOTT - JUDGE SCHOTT 11/3/21Instrument: 2021146057
Date: November 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT $12,860.87 AS TO TIM R MCDERMOTT - JUDGE SCHOTT 11/3/21Instrument: 2021146057 | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR BY PLTF | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY PLTF | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE BY PLTF | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING BY PLTF | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST TIM R MCDERMOTT - 9/13/21 | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE BY PLTF | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TIM R MCDERMOTT 8/3/21 | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/7/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.