Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mario Perez, Paula Perez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jesse Long, against St. Johns Insurance Company, Inc., represented by Noah Prosser, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category20 - Contract Indebt / Auto Neg /Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DT OF DEFT'S C/R
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 30, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 30, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE DEKLEVA 7/2/21
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION NOAH J PROSSER ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: July 21, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFT BY PLTFS
Date: August 05, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - ST JOHNS INS CO INC 7/13/21
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT
Date: August 16, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY DEFT
Date: August 16, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT
Date: August 02, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT
Date: August 16, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF
Date: October 18, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT
Date: August 27, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: October 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY PLTF | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BY DEFT | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFT BY PLTFS | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL DESIGNATION NOAH J PROSSER ESQ OBO DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.