Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Paul Cipparone, Sherri Cipparone, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Gregory Krak, against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, represented by Melissa Paul, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Settle |
DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY MELISSA MORGAN PAUL ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: July 20, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: July 08, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - ASI PREFERRED INS CORP
Date: June 30, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY GREGORY M KRAK ESQ OBO PLTFS
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA MORGAN PAUL ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFT
Date: July 20, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: October 04, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFT
Date: October 13, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT
Date: November 17, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT
Date: November 17, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 12/14/21
Date: December 14, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ASI PREFERRED INS CORP 7/6/21
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY DEFT
Date: November 18, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT
Date: November 17, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 12/14/21 @ 3PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 11/29/21
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING JAN 26 2022 @1:30PM
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF SHERRI CIPPARONE BY DEFT
Date: December 21, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTFS
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFT
Date: December 06, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES
Date: November 30, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN REVISED BY PARTIES
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF SHERRI CIPPARONE AS TRUSTEE ETC BY DEFT
Date: December 21, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT
Date: December 21, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF PAUL CIPPARONE
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF PAUL CIPPARONE BY DEFT
Date: December 21, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING ON 1/26/22 @ 1:30PM (AMENDED)
Date: January 19, 2022VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTFS
Date: February 10, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PLTF PAUL CIPPARONE
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT BY PLTFS
Date: January 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTFS | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED BY PLTF PAUL CIPPARONE | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT BY PLTFS | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTFS | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF PAUL CIPPARONE | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGS ETC BY PLTFS (AMENDED) | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 1/26/22 @ 1:30PM (AMENDED) | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGS BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ETC BY PLTFS | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF SHERRI CIPPARONE BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.