Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
James Briley, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by James Jenkins Iii, against American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Asi Assurance Corp, represented by Nicole Fluet, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with SUSAN STACY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category16L - Other-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY JAMES S JENKINS III OBO PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP
Date: June 30, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY NICOLE M FLUET ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: August 03, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AMERICAN STRATEGIC INS CORP 7/14/21
Date: July 15, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT BY PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT B TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT
Date: November 01, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT
Date: August 30, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY BY DEFT
Date: August 30, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: November 03, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS & TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT
Date: December 20, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT
Date: November 01, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ BY PLTF
Date: December 21, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFT
Date: November 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ BY PLTF | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS & TRANSFER VENUE BY DEFT | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION & 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFT | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY DEFT | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION BY DEFT | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY BY DEFT | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.