Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Daniel Fuller, Lauren Ickes, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brian Wisniewski, against Frontline Insurance Company, represented by Cristina Bianchi, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with SUSAN STACY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021COMPLAINT FILED W/ATTACHED CASE MGNT PLAN & ORDER
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL BY DEFT
Date: July 28, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY CRISTINA J BIANCHI ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: August 13, 2021LETTER TO JUDGE REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLY TO COURT ORDER ON 8/30/21 - JUDGE STACY 10/17/21
Date: October 18, 2021OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO OF CORP REP & M/FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT
Date: November 10, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT
Date: November 01, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 2ND TO DEFT BY PLTFS
Date: January 25, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES CONTENTION TO DEFT BY PLTFS
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DANIEL FULLER ON 4/6/22 @ 10AM
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY DEFT
Date: November 01, 2021ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS CMPL - JUDGE STACY 10/29/21
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF BRANDON HOLLAND ON 3/24/22 @ 10AM
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF LAUREN ICKES BY DEFT
Date: February 16, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION & OBJECTIONS BY DEFT
Date: February 24, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - FRONTLINE INS CO
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES & OBJECTIONS BY DEFT
Date: February 24, 2022MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS BY DEFT
Date: August 23, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY TO COURT ORDER ON AUG 30 2021 BY DEFT
Date: September 29, 2021LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 18, 2021LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF BRANDON HOLLAND MAR 24 2022 @10:00AM
Date: October 28, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG BY DEFT
Date: November 01, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFT CORP REP APR 19 2022 @10:00AM
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 2/17/22 @ 1:30PM - JUDGE STACY 1/12/22
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF DANIEL FULLER BY DEFT
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF BRANDON HOLLAND ON 3/24/22 @ 10AM | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION & OBJECTIONS BY DEFT | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES & OBJECTIONS BY DEFT | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF LAUREN ICKES BY DEFT | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF DANIEL FULLER BY DEFT | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 2ND TO DEFT BY PLTFS | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES CONTENTION TO DEFT BY PLTFS | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 2/17/22 @ 1:30PM - JUDGE STACY 1/12/22 | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DANIEL FULLER ON 4/6/22 @ 10AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.