Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Noel Ponce, Vanessa Ponce, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Eric Deming, against Farmers Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, represented by Christopher Cooper, Nikolaos Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
Category16L - Other-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CMPL BY PLTF
Date: October 28, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT
Date: August 02, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY ERIC DEMING ESQ OBO PLTF
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - FARMERS INS EXCHANGE
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - FARMERS INS EXCHANGE 7/7/21
Date: July 07, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF DISCOVERY BY DEFT
Date: September 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 9/14/21 @ 3PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 8/27/21
Date: August 27, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 9/7/21 WITH CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES
Date: September 08, 2021PHOTOCOPIED DOCUMENT OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 30, 2021ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFT - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 9/3/21
Date: September 03, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT
Date: August 31, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 30, 2021JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY DEFT
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OR CORRESPONDENCE TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CMPL TO ADD PARTY BY PLTF
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY COUNSEL FOR DEFT TRUCK INS EXCHANGE
Date: December 21, 2021[E-FILED]: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED CMPL BY DEFT
Date: February 21, 2022[E-FILED]: MOTION TO STAY & OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT
Date: February 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEFT MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTFS
Date: February 22, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/1/22
Date: March 01, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) BY DEFT
Date: March 24, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF VANESSA PONCE BY DEFT
Date: March 18, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF BY DEFT TRUCK INS EXCHANGE
Date: March 21, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT
Date: March 18, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF NOEL PONCE BY DEFT
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) BY DEFT | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLTF BY DEFT TRUCK INS EXCHANGE | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF VANESSA PONCE BY DEFT | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTFS BY DEFT | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF NOEL PONCE BY DEFT | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 3/1/22 | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEFT MOTION TO DISMISS BY PLTFS | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | [E-FILED]: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED CMPL BY DEFT | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | [E-FILED]: MOTION TO STAY & OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.