Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Seminole County Sheriff'S Office, filed a(n) Rpo - Risk Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. GALLUZZO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. GALLUZZO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryRpo - Risk Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Hearing |
FINAL RISK PROTECTION ORDER HEARING
Judge: JOHN D. GALLUZZO |
|
June 15, 2021 | Hearing |
RISK PROTECTION ORDER COMPLIANCE HEARING
Judge: JOHN D. GALLUZZO |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELLING COMPLIANCE HEARING SIGNED BY JUDGE GALLUZZO 6/11/21 | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: CRPO HEARING FOR JUDGE [P] ON 06/15/2021 AT 0830AM | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED 6/10/21 | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT / CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY SEMINOLE CTY SH | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RISK PROTECTION ORDER RETURNED SERVED 6/10/21 | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR RISK PROTECTION ORDER | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RISK PROTECTION ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE KRAUSE 6/10/21 | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.