Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Monai Simmons, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Studentcity.Com, Inc., represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management146 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryContract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time590 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO GET CORRECTED JUDGMENT PACKAGE TO COURT - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER HEARING SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES. Not Applicable |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER 08/12/11 HEARING FILED Not Applicable |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 8/12/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09 | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT VACATED |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ONLY ENTERED AS TO STUDENTCITY.COM, INC.. JUDGMENT CANNOT BE ENTERED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF - Minutes DROPPED BY COURT |
|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 12/13/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 09 | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 10/13/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09 | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
CHECK FOR JUDGMENT OSC ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.