Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jaguar Glassworks Pros Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bruce Kauffman, against Mga Ins Co Inc, represented by Michael Merrill, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JAMES J. DEKLEVA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
Category19P - Personal Injury Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFT
Date: June 22, 2020VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF
Date: November 25, 2020COMPLAINT FILED
Date: June 18, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT
Date: June 22, 2020REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: June 18, 2020MEMORANDUM IN COMPLIANCE W/RULE 1.500(C) TO DEFT
Date: September 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN COMPLIANCE W/RULE 1.500(C) TO DEFT | |
September 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY BRUCE H KAUFFMAN ESQ OBO PLTF | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MICHAEL MERRILL ESQ OBO DEFT | |
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT - JUDGE DEKLEVA 9/21/20 | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 09/21/2020 AT 1000AM | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PRE-TRIAL 9/21/20 10AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.