Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yulexy Solis, against Maurice P Tomlinson, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category19 - Contract/Indebted,Etc |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED -ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA
Date: January 02, 2020COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2019REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2019OPEN COURT MINUTES
Date: February 11, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED MAURICE P TOMLINSON
Date: February 06, 2020ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED MAURICE P TOMLINSON
Date: July 21, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA
Date: May 06, 2021REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: May 04, 2021OPEN COURT MINUTES
Date: July 27, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: November 23, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL -WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL -WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
July 27, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED MAURICE P TOMLINSON | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 07/27/2021 AT 0900AM | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED MAURICE P TOMLINSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.