Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Westlake Financial Svcs Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Manuel Peraza, against Terry Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category19 - Contract/Indebted,Etc |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2019REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2019REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: August 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED - TERRY THOMPSON | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 11/03/2020 AT 0900AM | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED-CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DEKLEVA | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: SUMMONS BY PLTF | |
February 11, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED TERRY THOMPSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.