Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jorge Palma, against Mutica A Degregory Johnson, represented by Jessica Most, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JAMES J. DEKLEVA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
Category19 - Contract/Indebted,Etc |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ
Date: November 01, 2021ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/11/20
Date: February 11, 2020REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2019COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 30, 2019MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION (ATTACHED) & ORDER DISMISSING CASE
Date: April 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJ | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL ACCEPTING STIP W/OUT PREJ - JUDGE DEKLEVA 4/5/20Instrument: 2020036959 | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION (ATTACHED) & ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - JUDGE DEKLEVA 2/11/20 | |
February 11, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL JESSICA I MOST ESQ OBO DEFT | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MUTICA A DEGREGORY JOHNSON 1/20/20 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.