Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Goldelm At Regency Oaks Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by James Barron Iii, against Mara Granger, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JAMES J. DEKLEVA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED - 1/22/20 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION MARA GRANGER- JUDGE DEKLEVA 1/17/20Instrument: 2020006444 | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST MARA GRANGER - 1/14/20 | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D MARA GRANGER POSTED 1/3/20 | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 5D MARA GRANGER | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.