Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Yulexy Solis, against Timothy B Lennon, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
SUMMONS ISSUED - TIMOTHY B LENNON
Date: December 30, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 12/14/21 @ 3PM - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 11/29/21
Date: November 29, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 12/6/21
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: December 30, 2019CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PLTF
Date: December 03, 2021COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 30, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - TIMOTHY B LENNON 9/17/21
Date: September 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TO PARTIES BY PLTF
Date: September 07, 2021RETURNED MAIL TO TIMOTHY B LENNON - UTF
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: March 01, 2022MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY PLTF
Date: March 01, 2022DEFAULT ENTERED BY THE CLERK AGAINST TIMOTHY B LENNON 12/13/2021
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE OF DEFT TIMOTHY B LENNON
Date: December 10, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO DEFT TIMOTHY B LENNON BYP LTF
Date: December 10, 2021WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT TIMOTHY B LENNON
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Date: March 01, 2022RETURNED MAIL TO TIMOTHY B LENNON - UTF
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING ON 4/26/22 @ 9:30AM
Date: March 16, 2022MOTION FOR PLTF & PLTF COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY ZOOM BY PLTF
Date: March 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PLTF & PLTF COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY ZOOM BY PLTF | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MAILING COPY OF ATTACHED LETTER & PROPOSED PRE TRIAL STATEMENT TO PARTIES BY PLTF | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TO TIMOTHY B LENNON - UTF | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 4/26/22 @ 9:30AM | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY PLTF | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FOR DEFT TIMOTHY B LENNON | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE & TRIAL DATE /PTC ON 4/26/22 @ 1:30PM & NON JURY TRIAL DURING (2) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING 5/9/22 - JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 2/25/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.