Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vineridge Assc Lp, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by James Barron Iii, against Trisha Songini, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DEBRA L KRAUSE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED POSSESSION 02/12/2018 | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO TRISHA SONGINI - JUDGE KRAUSE 2/5/18Instrument: 2018013640 | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D PSTD - TRISHA SONGINI ON 1/4/18 | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED - 1/31/18 | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TRISHA SONGINI | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 5D TRISHA SONGINI 1/2/18 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.