Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vineridge Associates Lp, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by James Barron Iii, against Angelo Beasley, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DEBRA L KRAUSE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D POSTED/ ANGELO BEASLEY ON 1/04/2018 | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM EMPLOYER GALE INSULATION & ANSWER BY DEFT | |
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ANGELO BEASLEY | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 5D ANGELO BEASLEY 1/2/18 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.