Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Benjamin Lefrancois, against Matthew Phillips, represented by Adam Campbell, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
Category08 - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 29, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT MATTHEW PHILLIPS
Date: January 29, 2018VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF
Date: June 12, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MATTHEW PHILLIPS ON 1/9/18
Date: January 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/PREJ BY PLTF
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF BY DEFT
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY ADAM J CAMPBELL ESQ OBO DEFT
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT MATTHEW PHILLIPS
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - MATTHEW PHILLIPS ON 1/9/18
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED - MATTHEW PHILLIPS
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.