Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Alafaya 355 Llc, Barbara Thuy Anh Luong, Tran Uyen, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Louis Gonzalez, against Security First Ins Co, Security First Insurance Company, represented by Iniv Gabay, Latravia Smith, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with SUSAN STACY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON PLTF BY DEFT
Date: June 03, 2019COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED - SECURITY FIRST INS CO
Date: December 29, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT BY PLTF
Date: December 29, 2017DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY LOUIS A GONZALEZ OBO PLTF
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET TO DEFT BY P LTF
Date: December 29, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 29, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT
Date: February 05, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTF
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY INIV GABAY ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: January 12, 2018DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT
Date: January 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING DEC 10 2019 @9:30AM
Date: August 21, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 12/10/19 @ 9:30AM
Date: December 09, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (AMENDED) 1ST TO DEFT BY PLTFS
Date: February 28, 2020AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY PLTFS
Date: February 28, 2020DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS (AMENDED) BY LOUIS A GONZALEZ OBO PLTFS
Date: February 28, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (AMENDED) 1ST SET TO DEFT BY PTLFS
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CMPL (2ND) BY PLTFS
Date: March 24, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (AMENDED) TO DEFT BY PTLFS
Date: February 28, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES
Date: September 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY INIV GABAY ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: July 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION (AMENDED) BY DEFT
Date: March 31, 2020LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 27, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 9/25/21
Date: September 27, 2021LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 29, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CMPL - JUDGE STACY 11/25/21
Date: November 29, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & JURY DEMAND TO 2ND AMENDED CMPL BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INS CO
Date: February 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF TRAN UYEN & BARBARA THUY ANH LUONG APR 28 2022 @1:30PM | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & JURY DEMAND TO 2ND AMENDED CMPL BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INS CO | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CMPL - JUDGE STACY 11/25/21 | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE STACY REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - JUDGE STACY 9/25/21 | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY PARTIES | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER & NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGMENT HEARING TO ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO 21-24 2ND AMENDED ON 10/18/21 @ 3PM - JUDGE STACY 9/20/21 | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY INIV GABAY ESQ OBO DEFT | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT PURSUANT TO ADMIN ORDER 21-24 - JUDGE STACY 7/22/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.