Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Glass Replacements Llc Aao Jean Calixte, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sean Amorginos, against Nationwide Ins Co Of America, Titan Indemnity Co, represented by Trevor Rhodes, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
Category19P - Personal Injury Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2015REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2015COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 30, 2015SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT
Date: January 04, 2016DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT
Date: February 08, 2016MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT
Date: February 08, 2016OPEN COURT MINUTES
Date: February 17, 2016NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 16, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY TREVOR RHODES ESQ OBO DEFT
Date: February 08, 2016NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TO TITAN INS CO ON 1/15/16
Date: February 16, 2016VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: February 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2016 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT MINUTES | |
February 17, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT |
|
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TO TITAN INS CO ON 1/15/16 | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS BY DEFT | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFT | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY TREVOR RHODES ESQ OBO DEFT | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | AUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] on 02/17/2016 at 0930AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.