Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lloyds Of Shelton Auto Glass Llc Aao Jeffrey Allen, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kristy Barrows, against Allied Property & Casualty Ins Co, Nationwide Ins Co Of America, Nationwide Mutual Ins Co, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
Category19P - Personal Injury Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2015CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 30, 2015COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 30, 2015VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ
Date: January 21, 2016NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS TO NATIONWIDE INS CO ON AMERICA ON 1/13/16
Date: February 01, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS TO NATIONWIDE INS CO ON AMERICA ON 1/13/16 | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SCHOTT | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | AUTO ASSIGN: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] on 02/17/2016 at 0930AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.