Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Christina Ecker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Richard Ecker, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DONNA L. MCINTOSH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
Category02D - Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 20-30-S | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL/TO FAMILY COURT (1 HOUR) | |
July 01, 2018 | Docket Event | REASSIGNED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 18-28-S | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE JONATHAN EDWIN MILLS ESQ OBO C ECKER | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | REPORT & RECOMMENDATION W/ORDER ON 2ND CASE MGMT CONF/JUDGE RECKSIEDLER 8/4/16 | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET / R ECKER | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN / SIGNED BY RESP ONLY | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE AD ORD 95-4-S PARENT SEM / R ECKER | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / R ECKER | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT / C ECKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.