Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sandpiper Casselberry Llc Dba Sandpiper Apt, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brian Wolk, against Gilbert Hinde, Rosemarie Wasser, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED SERVED | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO ROSEMARIE WASSER & GILBERT HINDE - JUDGE COLLINS 1/22/16Instrument: 2016008512 | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D - ROSEMARIE WASSER & GILBERT HINDE ON 1/8/16 | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ROSEMARIE WASSER & GILBERT HINDE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 5D ROSEMARIE WASSER & GILBERT HINDE - 12/31/15 | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.