Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tampa Bay Emergency Physicians Pl, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Wendelyn Gowen, against Government Employees Ins Co, represented by Kelly Wilson, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFREDERIC M. SCHOTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
Category19P - Personal Injury Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 30, 2014REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLTFS FIRST TO DEFT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO
Date: January 26, 2015ANS AND AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLTFS COMPLAINT / BY DEFT
Date: February 25, 2015NOTICE OF SERV OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO
Date: January 26, 2015RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS / BY DEFT GEICO GENERAL INS CO
Date: February 25, 2015REQUEST FOR PRETRIAL SUMMONS
Date: December 30, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS /PLTFS FIRST TO DEFT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO
Date: January 26, 2015VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: July 31, 2015REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 17, 2015NOTICE OF FILING CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF EXPERT WITNESS FEES / BY PLTF | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERV OF INTERROGATORIES REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS / BY PLTF | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS REGARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS / BY PLTF | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS / BY PLTF | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY BY WENDOLYN L GOWEN ESQ OBO PLTF | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ANS AND AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLTFS COMPLAINT / BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.