Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Charleston Club Partners Ltd, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brian Wolk, against Cassandra Langford, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with FREDERIC M. SCHOTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFREDERIC M. SCHOTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2016 | Hearing |
LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: FREDERIC M. SCHOTT |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - LOPInstrument: 2016022679 | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL LOP NOTICE - C LANGFORD - UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: LOP HEARING FOR JUDGE [S] ON 03/02/2016 AT 0130PM | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ENTERED 1/15/15 CASSANDRA LANGFORD | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D CASSANDRA LANGFORD POSTED 1/5/2015 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING CASSANDRA LANGFORD | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.