Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gre Town Centre Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by James Barron Iii, against Geraldine Scipio, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JERRI L. COLLINS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERRI L. COLLINS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED UNSERVED | |
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 2/2/15 | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DUPLICATE: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - 1/28/15-S | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION + $198 COSTS GERALDINE SCIPIO - 1/26/15-SInstrument: 2015009218 | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5D GERALDINE SCIPIO 1/5/2015 | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ENTERED 1/21/15 GERALDINE SCIPIO | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING GERALDINE SCIPIO | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 5D GERALDINE SCIPIO 1/2/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.