Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bryan Manno, against Giselle E Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JAMES J. DEKLEVA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2013 |
Category19 - Contract/Indebted,Etc |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
STIPULATION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF
Date: September 29, 2017ORDER ON MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT5 PTC *DENIED* 6/11/13-R
Date: June 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL FOR PLTF | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT $2621.07 GISELLE E RODRIGUEZ 11/1/13-ZInstrument: 2013141371 | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLTF | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY (SUPPLEMENTAL) BY PLTF | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF BY PLTF | |
September 10, 2013 | Hearing |
PRE TRIAL
Judge: JAMES J. DEKLEVA |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERKS MINUTES ; PT LD (NO HRG) | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED GISELLE E RODRIGUEZ 9/10/13-Z | |
September 04, 2013 | Docket Event | CALENDAR: PT HEARING FOR JUDGE [Z] ON 09/10/2013 AT 0900AM | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GISELLE E RODRIGUEZ 6/12/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.