Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Masters Academy Of Central Fl Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Nancy Whitmore, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MARK E. HERR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category19 - Contract/Indebted,Etc |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2009STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS/NANCY WHITMORE
Date: February 02, 2010VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ NANCY WHITMOREInstrument: 2010119284
Date: October 11, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2010 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ NANCY WHITMOREInstrument: 2010119284 | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS/NANCY WHITMORE | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CLERKS MINUTES PT KAB (NO HRG) | |
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED NANCY WHITMORE | |
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event | SEMINOLE COUNTY SHERIFF W/CHECK - JUDGE HERR | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 02/02/2010 09:00 AM|Reason: PT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.