Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eric J Weber filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with KENNETH R. LESTER, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryPep - Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | REOPEN FOR SRS | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING GUARDIANSHIP FILE WARD HAS REACHED AGE OF MAJORITYInstrument: 2010135629 | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | INITIAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN (NO ORDER) | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIANInstrument: 2010001517 | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | OATH OF GUARDIAN, AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE BY MICHAEL J WEBERInstrument: 2010001518 | |
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIPInstrument: 2010001519 | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSENT JENNIFER WEBBER | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIANInstrument: 2009148235 | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.