Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Evelyn Cloninger filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. GALLUZZO presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryFa - Formal Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGEInstrument: 2011103354 | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | WAIVER- ACCT,PORTIONS &SERV OF PETN DISCHARGE,RECPT &CONSENT TO DISCHARGE WALTER WALLACE COOK | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF ELECTIVE SHARE | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING AMOUNT OF ELECTIVE SHARE & AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF ELECTIVE SHARE TO PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF SPOUSE'S ESTATE 6/14/11 JUDGE GALLUZZO | |
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event | JOINT PETITION FOR ORDER DETERMINING AMT. OF ELECTIVE SHARE & AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF ELECTIVE SHARE | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | P. R.'S PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF ELECTIVE SHARE | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | FORMAL NOTICE | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.