Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Buffy Thomas, against Sarah L Smith, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DONALD L. MARBLESTONE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category20 - Contract Indebt / Auto Neg /Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDism/Dispo Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL SARAH L SMITHInstrument: 2010123554 | |
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT /BY PLTF | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 20/D 1/6/10 SARAH L SMITH | |
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY SARAH L SMITH | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSD 20D SARAH L SMITH - OC/SOSC W/CK | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.