Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Jessica Loshin, against Jan Velen, Lake Howell Arms Condo Assn Inc, represented by Matthew Gross, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with LINDA D. SCHOONOVER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category14F - Mtg Foreclosure/Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE/BY PLTF
Date: May 04, 2011COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2009ASSIGNMENT BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MTG ASSOCIATION
Date: August 01, 2011MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Date: June 28, 2010NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT & SUMMONS FROM JAN VELEN (ATTACHED) BY PLTF
Date: March 16, 2010AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2010NOTICE OF FILING/ORIGINAL MTG & ASSIGNMENT OF MTG (ATTACHED)/BY PLTF
Date: July 29, 2010NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BID BY PLTF
Date: August 01, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF LOST WRIT OF POSSESSION 204 GEORGETOWN DRIVE CONDO UNIT #204C A/K/A APARTMENT C|CASSELBERRY FL 32707 12/09/11
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED/ALIAS/POSSESSION 204 GEORGETOWN DRIVE CONDO UNIT 204C AKA APT C CASSELBERRY FL 32707/|SCSO
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
WRIT ISSUED/POSSESSION 204 GEORGETOWN DRIVE CONDO UNIT #204C AKA APT C CASSELBERRY FL 32707/SCSO
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ON 204 GEORGETOWN DRIVE, CONDO UNIT #204C CASSELBERRY,FL|32707 - SCHOONOVER 11/4/11
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION/204 GEORGETOWN DRIVE|CONDO UNIT #204C AKA APARTMENT C, CASSELBERRY FL 32707 BY PLTF
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATION OF NOTICE TO OCCUPANTS BY PLTF
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT NONE
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO PLTF
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MTG ASSOCIATION
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BID BY PLTF
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.