Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jo Ann Williams, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Pro Se, against Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Crown Bank, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with NANCY F. ALLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed After Hrg-Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL- From LopInstrument: 2011100466 | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION- From Lop | |
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | LOP Calendar Date 9/19/2011 Location: A LOP-Judge: NANCY F. ALLEY Hearing Time: 09:00 AM | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | COPIES | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED/CROWN BANK 3/12/10 | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED/CROWN BANK, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK/OC TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | LIS PENDENSInstrument: 2010000826 | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF BILL IN EQUITY | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.