Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Home Finance L L C, Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Myriam Clerge, against Jo Anne Berens, Joel Cutler, Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, Scott K Wright, represented by Luis Carreja, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MELANIE CHASE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category14H - Homestead/Residential Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClose Supplemental |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2009ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF TO BE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA/DICKEY 9/6/11Instrument: 2011097299
Date: September 07, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY DEFT JO ANN BERNS TO PLTF
Date: March 01, 2010NOTICE OF FILING PLTF'S UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEFT'S 1ST INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF BY PLTF
Date: October 04, 2010MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME BY PLTF
Date: May 06, 2010RESPONSES TO DEFTS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF
Date: October 04, 2010NOTICE OF FILING PLTFS RESPONSES TO DEFTS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION BY PLTF
Date: October 04, 2010MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PLTF/BY PLTF
Date: September 01, 2011CONSENT TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFT JO ANNE BERENS
Date: December 02, 2013SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO VAC FCL SALE, STOP ISSUANCE OF CERT OF TITLE ETC BY PLTF
Date: June 06, 2014SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO RESET FCLR SALE BY PLTF
Date: January 28, 2015CONSENT TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFT JO ANNE BERENS
Date: November 27, 2013ORDER ON MTN TO RESET FCLR SALE DATE/GRANTED; RESET FOR 4/7/15 - SANDERS 2/4/15
Date: February 05, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT CONSENT $111,450.63 -SANDERS 12/2/13Instrument: 2013152009
Date: December 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO FEDERAL NATL MTG ASSN
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS NONE
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM BY CLERK TO CHOICE LEGAL RE: CT
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE OF BIDS- FILE BACK 4/20/15
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS & CALCULATION OF STATUTORILY ACCRUED INTEREST BY PLTF (ATTACHED)
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE $100.00 TO PLTF (PROOF OF PUB ATTACHED)
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION RTND NOTICE OF SALE 4/7/15
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 4/7/15
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MTN TO RESET FCLR SALE DATE/GRANTED; RESET FOR 4/7/15 - SANDERS 2/4/15
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO RESET FCLR SALE BY PLTF
Judge: MELANIE CHASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.