Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Elizabeth Wellborn, against Beth Reardon, Rebecca Stockwell, Villas At Lakeside Condo Assn Inc, represented by Douglas Rankin, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MARLENE M ALVA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category14F - Mtg Foreclosure/Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
FINAL JUDGMENT/IN REM $210,549.72- ALVA 7/6/12Instrument: 2012089102
Date: July 06, 2012COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2009NOTICE OF FILING/ORDER LIFTING THE AUTOMATIC STAY (ATTACHED)/BY PLTF
Date: October 15, 2010MOTION TO WITHDRAW LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J STERN PA AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF
Date: January 12, 2011AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 30, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT NONE
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO PLTF
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE $31,100.00 BY PLTF (PROOF OF PUBLICATION ATTACHED)
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE OF BIDS- FILE BACK 9/17/12
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT/IN REM $210,549.72- ALVA 7/6/12Instrument: 2012089102
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 09/04/2012
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 7/6/12 AT 9AM
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE BY PLTF (ATTACHED)
Judge: MARLENE M ALVA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.