Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Elyce Schweitzer, against Crescent Place At Lake Lotus Condo Assn Inc, Manish Singh, Narsimha Rao, represented by Paul Hinckley, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with LINDA D. SCHOONOVER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category14F - Mtg Foreclosure/Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Case Outcome TypeOther Disposition |
FINAL JUDGMENT $157,333.82- RUDISILL 1/12/12Instrument: 2012005564
Date: January 12, 2012ANSWER FILED PRO SE BY NARASIMHARO V MEDA (NOT A NAMED PTY)/COPY SENT TO ATTY
Date: January 06, 2010ANSWER BY DEFT CRESCENT PLACE AT LAKE LOTUS CONDOMINIUM ASSN INC
Date: January 19, 2010COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2009REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT CRESCENT PLACE AT LAKE LOTUS CONDO ASSN|INC
Date: January 19, 2010MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Date: March 11, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO FEDERAL NATL MTG ASSN
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT NONE
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE OF BIDS- FILE BACK 3/26/12
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE $100.00 BY PLTF W/ PROOF OF PUBLICATION ATTACHED
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 3/13/12
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT $157,333.82- RUDISILL 1/12/12Instrument: 2012005564
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 1/12/12 @ 9AM
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL MORGAN SWENK, ESQ OBO PLTF
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL RECORDED MORTGAGE & BANKRUPTCY|DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR AS TO MANISH SINGH (ATTACHED) BY PLTF
Judge: LINDA D. SCHOONOVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.