Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bac Home Loans Servicing Lp, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Lynn Vouis, against Neli Borisova Hristova, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category14F - Mtg Foreclosure/Lien |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2009FINAL JUDGMENT $214,489.79/RUDISILL 8/4/11Instrument: 2011085409
Date: August 04, 2011MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BY PLTF
Date: September 02, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT NONE
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE OF BIDS FILE BACK 10/17/11
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO PLTF W/ATTACHED PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 10/4/11
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT $214,489.79/RUDISILL 8/4/11Instrument: 2011085409
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 08/04/11 AT 9:00 AM
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING|PREVIOUS AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS BY PLTF.
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF STATUS BY PLTF
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.