Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ing Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Dennis Bailey, against Regions Bank, Syeda Akbar, Syed Zaidi, represented by Anthony Legendre Ii, David Weisman, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category14H - Homestead/Residential Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Before Hrg-Other |
THIS CASE REASSIGNED FROM DIVISION L TO DIVISION G PER ADMIN ORDER 11-05-S
Date: May 26, 2011MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION BY DEFTS "ZAIDI" & "AKBAR"
Date: October 15, 2010PLTF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALInstrument: 2011086136
Date: August 09, 2011ANSWER/FILED BY DEFT REGIONS BANK SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO AMSOUTH BANK
Date: April 23, 2010COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 31, 2009MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE BY DEFTS "ZAIDI" & "AKBAR"
Date: October 15, 2010MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY FOR DEFT SYED ZAIDI/KRISTOPHER M CRUZADA
Date: October 01, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFTS' MOTION TO TAX FEES AND COSTS
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO TAX FEES & COSTS BY DEFTS SYED ZAIDI & SYEDA F AKBAR
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
August 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 8/25/11 @ 10:30 AM
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
PLTF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALInstrument: 2011086136
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 08/25/11 AT 10:30 AM
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
THIS CASE REASSIGNED FROM DIVISION L TO DIVISION G PER ADMIN ORDER 11-05-S
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL BY DEFT SYED ZAIDI
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BY DEFT SYED ZAIDI
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION & SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFTS SYED ZAIDI & SYEDA F AKBAR IS KAUFMAN, ENGLETT|& LYND PLLC
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BRANDON TYSON IS HEREBY SUB'D IN PLACE OF KRISTOPHER M|CRUZADA OBO DEFTS SYED ZAIDI & SYEDA F AKBAR/ALLEY 10/15/10
Judge: MICHAEL J. RUDISILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.