Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Philip Orsi, against Rhona Miller, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with ALAN A. DICKEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY RHONA MILLER CASE #6:10-BK-08604-KSJ MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FL
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AGST DEFT RHONA MILLER $28,835.32/DICKEY 4/15/10Instrument: 2010044792
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM (CASE STILL PENDING)
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY PLTF
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FOR RHONA MILLER
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ENTERED - 3/8/10 AGST RHONA MILLER
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED/RHONA MILLER 01/07/10
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED/RHONA MILLER/SCSO
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FILED
Judge: ALAN A. DICKEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.