Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Almar Development Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Todd Vraspir, against Total Comm Systems Inc, represented by Patrick Mclaughlinm, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2009 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeOther Disposition |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT BY MICHAEL POLLITT
Date: October 28, 2011SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT BY PLTF
Date: November 04, 2011ANS AND AFFIRM DEFENSES & MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFT TOTAL COMM SYSTEMS INC
Date: June 10, 2013RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQ/ADMISSION BY DEFT
Date: June 19, 2013NOTICE OF SERV OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET OF INTERROGS BY DEFT
Date: December 10, 2013NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGS, REQ/PRODUCE DOCS & REQ/ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT
Date: June 26, 2013ORDER OF DISMISSAL - LOPInstrument: 2015093633
Date: August 17, 2015MEDIATION REPORT-SETTLED -CASE WAS COMPLETELY SETTLED HOWARD R MARSEE MEDIATOR
Date: March 04, 2014REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT. TOTAL COMM SYSTEMS, INC.
Date: May 11, 2009PLTFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION UPON DEFT TOTAL COMM SYSTEMS INC
Date: May 11, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Hearing |
LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: JESSICA J. RECKSIEDLER |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - LOPInstrument: 2015093633 | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT-SETTLED -CASE WAS COMPLETELY SETTLED HOWARD R MARSEE MEDIATOR | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 3/3/14 @ 10AM - HOWARD MARSEE ESQ MEDIATOR | |
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event | TRIAL NOTIFICATION DURING (2) WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING 3/10/14 - JUDGE NELSON 12/13/13 | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERV OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES 1ST SET OF INTERROGS BY DEFT | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL BENCH/NO EARLIER THAN MARCH 2014 | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGS, REQ/PRODUCE DOCS & REQ/ADMISSIONS TO PLTF BY DEFT | |
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQ/ADMISSION BY DEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.