Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Andrea Muth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against David Blandford, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL J. RUDISILL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category02D - Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY SARA HOWELLER,ESQ FOR RESP | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DOM ON R&R OF GM DTD 6/18/09 RUDISILL 7/7/09Instrument: 2009075423 | |
June 23, 2009 | Docket Event | REPORT & RECOMMENDATION OF GM FOR F/J DOM CARPENTER 6/18/09 | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT SHEET AND COURT MINUTES 4/29/09 | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | CERT/AD ORD 95-4-S PARENT SEM BY ANDREA MUTH | |
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT ANDREA BLANDFORD | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | REPORT & RECOMMENDATION W/ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT DICKEY 3/26/09 - TRIAL 4/29/09 1PM CDD | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | OPEN COURT SHEET AND COURT MINUTES 3/24/09 | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GEN MAGISTRATE 3/24/09 1PM PERRY 2/17/09 | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE NJ TRIAL/TO FAMILY DEPT ONE (1) HR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.