Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Plantation Lakes Ii Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by James Barron Iii, against Kelly Rodriguez Danish, Kelly Rodriguezdanish, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with DONALD L. MARBLESTONE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDONALD L. MARBLESTONE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category21 - Evictions |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Default |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED O/C SOSC W/CK $70 | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT CT I/ KELLY RODRIGUEZ-DANISH 1/15/09 SInstrument: 2009006413 | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /BY PLTF | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED/PSTD 5/D 1/3/09 KELLY RODRIGUEZ-DANISH | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ENTERED - KELLY RODRIGUEZ-DANISH | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE & PROPER VENUE/AFF SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDG FOR POSSESSION | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING KELLY RODRIGUEZ-DANISH | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED 5D KELLY RODRIGUEZ-DANISH O/C PRSR | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.