Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Countrywide Home Loans Servicing Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sarah Kinnett, against Douglas Widener, Jeanine Vasquez, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with ALAN A. DICKEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALAN A. DICKEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
Category14H - Homestead/Residential Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClose Supplemental |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2014 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR BOND/ORIG DOC/EXHIBIT - NOTE | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORIGINAL NOTE/MTG TO PLTF'S ATTY | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND SUBSTITUTE PTHOTSTATIC COPIES-GRANTED/SANDERS 4/30/14 | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIG DOCS BY PLTF | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJ & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENSInstrument: 2014025940 | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL BY PLTF (ATTACHED) | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST BY PLTF | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | TRIAL NOTIFICATION ON 4/21/14 AT 9:30AM - JUDGE SANDERS 2/19/14 | |
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT & RECOMMENDATION W/ORDER APPROVED - DICKEY 2/19/14 | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 2/14/14 AT 9AM & REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE - JUDGE DICKEY 1/23/14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.