Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
George Goebel, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Eric Ludwig, against Timothy R Sobloewski, Jennifer R Sobolewski, Randy Williams, Frank Sobolewski, Us Steel Corp, (total of 5) See All represented by Mark Hutchison, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with ALAN A. DICKEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2004 |
Category15 - Contract/Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed After Hrg-Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION,NOTICE,JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL JUDGE DICKEY 080806|CRT ROOM H 9:30AM LOP HRG | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | * * * * DO NOT DOCKET. GIVE TO LOP CLERK * * * * | |
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event | YEARLY REASSIGNMENT FROM JUDGE: W TO: W | |
April 08, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ERIC W LUDWIG OBO PLTF|GEORGE GOEBEL | |
February 09, 2005 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ERIC W LUDWIG OBO PLTF (FILED IN|OPEN COURT) | |
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION BY DEFTS TO SET ASIDE AND RELIEF FROM DEFAULTS | |
February 04, 2005 | Docket Event | ANS AND AFFIRM DEFENSES BY DEFTS | |
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FEES & COSTS BY PLTF | |
February 02, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 2/9/05 AT 8:30AM SIMMONS | |
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER STRICKING PLEADINGS & ENTERING DEFAULTS AGST|US STEEL CORP,TIMOTHY R SOBOLEWSKI & RANDY WILLIAMS|BY MCINTOSH 1/27/05 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.