Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jack R Campbell, Christopher Anderson, Cod Trees Inc, filed a(n) 16 - Other Circuit Civil case represented by Anita Geraci Carver, against Seminole County Fl, represented by Gregory Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Seminole County, FL, . Seminole County, FL Superior Courts with MICHAEL J. RUDISILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2004 |
Category16 - Other Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSeminole County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJInstrument: 2009052127 | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSTION OF GARY GERSON ON 04/03/09 @ 10 AM | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT/BY DEFT SEMINOLE COUNTY FL | |
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT BY PLTFS | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO DT PAUL ROPER 3/30/09 @ 2 PM | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF STAN DEFREITAS ON 04/02/09 @ 10 AM | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT BY DEFT | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST BY DEFT | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED WITNESS LIST BY DEFT | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED(2ND)NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DT GARY R GERSON 4/3/09 @10:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.