Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Casey, Daniel Norton filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with RUHL, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2024 |
CategoryFormal - Probate (South County) |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED AND RECORDED | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $165.00 RECEIPT #2024051801 | |
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | CHECKLIST | |
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2024050211 | |
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION | |
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE - PUBLIC | |
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT | |
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | WAIVER - OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.