Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Truist Bank Successor By Merger To Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) Homeres4Close$50,001-$250,000 case represented by Kopf, Jennifer, against American Builders & Contractors Supply Co Inc, Bayfront Health Port Charlotte, Beacon Sales Acquisition Inc, Chase Bank Usa N A, Gulf Coast Building Materials, (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with CARROLL, HUNTER W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2024 |
CategoryHomeres4Close$50,001-$250,000 |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
The document is a verified complaint filed by Truist Bank to foreclose a residential mortgage against James G. Joyce in Sarasota County, Florida. The complaint alleges a default on the mortgage due to missed payments, with an unpaid balance of $77,84...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 11, 2024COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99
Date: April 11, 2024NOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: April 11, 2024LIS PENDENS-RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2024049991)
Date: April 11, 2024ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: April 18, 2024PAYMENT $1,045.00 RECEIPT #2024035012
Date: April 12, 2024SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHASE BANK USA NA - ISSUED 4/12/2024
Date: April 11, 2024NOTICE-FILING - POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: April 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 07/29/2024 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SET FOR 07/29/2024 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,045.00 RECEIPT #2024035012 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1 IF LIVING AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANT(S) - ISSUED 4/12/2024 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BANK - ISSUED 4/12/2024 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PORT CHARLOTTE HMA INC DBA BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE - ISSUED 4/12/2024 | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.