Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Confidential, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cb By And Through Christopher Best Parent, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with BREWER, DANIELLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBREWER, DANIELLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2023 |
CategorySexual Violence South County 2010 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: CIVIL INJUNCTION HEARING (SOUTH COUNTY) DATE: Apr 4 2024 9:00AM JUDGE: BREWER, DANIELLE LOCATION: JACS | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED - SERVED CB BY AND THROUGH CHRISTOPHER BEST | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: CIVIL INJUNCTION HEARING (SOUTH COUNTY) DATE: Oct 5 2023 9:00AM JUDGE: BREWER, DANIELLE LOCATION: JACS | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ACTION: PETITIONER PACKET HAND DELIVERED | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PHYSICAL DESCRIPTION - SSO | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PHYSICAL DESCRIPTION | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.