Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Scurry, Destinnie Cherrelle, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Huggins, Ryan D, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with HALE, LAURA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHALE, LAURA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryChild Support Ivd 2010 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DELINQUENCY - RECORDED (OR. / 2022091669) | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AUDIT REPORT SUPPORT | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT AND ENTRY OF SUPERSEDING CHILD SUPPORT ORDER - RECORDED (OR. / 2022044153) | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT HISTORY - CERTIFIED COPY FROM CASE 15DR2349 PER ORDER | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - INCOME DEDUCTION | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORT GUIDELINES | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - BIRTH RECORDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.